This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:25:32 (UTC).

HOEL - LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 HOEL - LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

CAITLYN M HOEL

JILL M HOEL

DAVID A HOEL

Conservatee

SARAH E HOEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

MEIER LAW FIRM

Conservatee Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1483991 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2018 06:12:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY HOEL, CAITLYN M. ON 03/29/2018; Filing Party: HOEL, CAITLYN M. ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • JILL M. HOEL, DAVID A. HOEL, CAITLYN M. HOEL APPOINTED AS CO-LIMITED CONSERVATOR OF PERSON ONLY OF SARAH ELIZABETH HOEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY DAVID A. HOEL, JILL M. HOEL, AND CAITLYN M. HOEL IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED.; Filing Party: DAVID A. HOEL, JILL M. HOEL, AND CAITLYN M. HOEL IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2020 AT 03:00:00 PM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR 03/27/2018 01:45:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • THE COURT ORDERS THE INVESTIGATION ASSESSMENT FEE OF $500.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • VOTE - CONSERVATEE, SARAH ELIZABETH HOEL, IS NOT DISQUALIFIED FROM VOTING.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2018 AT 01:45:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 200 - APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233645 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057325.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428741 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 03:05:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, DAVID A.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, DAVID A.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CITATION RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM FILED BY HOEL, DAVID A.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HOEL, DAVID A.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM FILED BY HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, DAVID A. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, DAVID A. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED BY HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, DAVID A.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, DAVID A.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM FILED BY HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HOEL, CAITLYN M.; HOEL, JILL M. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.