This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 04:35:10 (UTC).

HO V CHEN

Case Summary

On 05/22/2013 HO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4772

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tim Ho

Petitioner

HO, TIM

Defendant

Stephanie Chen

Respondent

CHEN, STEPHANIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 07/29/2014 13:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • JUDGMENT 06/27/2014 15:25:00 # Pages:23; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/27/2014 15:24:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 06/27/2014 15:24:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 06/27/2014 15:24:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/27/2014 15:23:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 06/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUANCE 05/27/2014 13:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/24/2013 15:51:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/06/2013 10:41:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 14:41:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CHEN, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 08/12/2013 14:40:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CHEN, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/12/2013 14:40:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CHEN, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 15:47:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CHEN, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/22/2013 13:37:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/22/2013 13:37:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • SUMMONS 05/22/2013 13:37:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/22/2013 13:37:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: HO, TIM

    Read MoreRead Less