Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 14:51:50 (UTC).

HERST - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 HERST - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEGAN HERST

Minor

WYATT HERST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingDescription: COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR (CNT); Department: C07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR 03/17/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR CONTINUED TO 05/12/2021 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41167438 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2021 11:09:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FILED BY HERST, MEGAN ON 03/11/2021; Filing Party: HERST, MEGAN ON 03/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docket(P) COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 201 - FIRST PAPERS-OTHER PROBATE: PETITION COMMENCING OTHER PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE PROBATE CODE AND OBJECTIONS OR OTHER OPPOSITION TO SUCH PETITIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12840450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667969.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3977393 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021 11:42:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OR DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT PROCEEDS FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY FILED BY HERST, MEGAN ON 02/02/2021; Filing Party: HERST, MEGAN ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less