This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 05:01:19 (UTC).

HERITAGE PLAZA VS. LARRY CARLSON

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 HERITAGE PLAZA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LARRY CARLSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERITAGE PLAZA

Defendants

LARRY CARLSON

SHELLEY HINTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN E. BOUZANE

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 07/03/2017

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 07/03/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 04/12/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 04/12/2017

JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY HERITAGE PLAZA REJECTED ON 03/16/2017.

JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY HERITAGE PLAZA REJECTED ON 03/16/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/19/16) RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/19/16) RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/19/16) RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/19/16) RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/19/16) RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/19/16) RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4744449 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017 03:43:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY HERITAGE PLAZA REJECTED ON 03/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 03/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1349460 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016 03:54:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12036669 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11860673.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HERITAGE PLAZA ON 09/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4612285 RECEIVED ON 09/27/2016 07:08:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less