This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 06:44:38 (UTC).

HERBERT F. BOECKMANN VS. SNOWSHOE PROPERTIES

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 HERBERT F BOECKMANN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SNOWSHOE PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Herbert F. Boeckmann II

HERBERT F. BOECKMANN

Jane Boeckmann

Defendants

Buchalter

Edward Bayuk

Nossaman LLP

SNOWSHOE PROPERTIES

Snowshoe Properties, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nossaman LLP

Defendant Attorney

Law Offices of Clinton L. Hubbard

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/08/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/08/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/08/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/08/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12656732 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12481371.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12656732 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12481371.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 11/08/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 11/08/2019.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/14/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/14/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/14/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/14/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/11/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/11/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BAYUK, EDWARD; SNOWSHOE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 12/18/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BAYUK, EDWARD; SNOWSHOE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 12/18/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12678740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12503546.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12678740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12503546.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1702195 RECEIVED ON 12/24/2019 12:38:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12678740 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12503546.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BAYUK, EDWARD; SNOWSHOE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2871937 RECEIVED ON 12/18/2019 02:32:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3866245 RECEIVED ON 12/11/2019 04:37:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2859780 RECEIVED ON 11/14/2019 11:30:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 11/08/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12656732 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12481371.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BOECKMANN, HERBERT F. II; BOECKMANN, JANE ON 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41032920 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2019 05:22:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUCHALTER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NOSSAMAN LLP is a litigant