This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:08 (UTC).

HENSON VS. BERGMAN FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 HENSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BERGMAN FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHLEEN HENSON

Defendant

BERGMAN FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY BERGMAN FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC. ON 06/03/2016; Filing Party: BERGMAN FAMILY CHIROP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 06/03/2016; Filing Party: HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 06/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/03/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • MEDIATION WAS SUCCESSFUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 03/08/2016; Filing Party: HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • HENSON, KATHLEEN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: HENSON, KATHLEEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.