This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 07:35:32 (UTC).

HELEN LEE VS. KIEWIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 HELEN LEE filed an Other lawsuit against KIEWIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helen Lee

Defendants

Kiewit Corporation

Kiewit Infrastructure WestCo.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Yohan Lee

Defendant Attorney

Bradley & Gmelich LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784608 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611407.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784608 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611407.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/21/2020

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/21/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/27/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/27/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/27/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/27/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 11/23/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 11/23/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 11/23/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 11/23/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12812290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12639369.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12812290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12639369.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 01/19/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 01/19/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3972403 RECEIVED ON 01/19/2021 08:43:19 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 01/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12812290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12639369.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41135556 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2020 05:06:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY KIEWIT INFRASTRUCTURE WESTCO. ON 11/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3949462 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2020 11:27:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1779747 RECEIVED ON 10/21/2020 06:32:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 10/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 09/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12784608 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12611407.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LEE, HELEN ON 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1770606 RECEIVED ON 09/22/2020 03:57:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIEWIT CORPORATION is a litigant