This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 07:02:36 (UTC).

HECTOR RODRIGUEZ VS. NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 HECTOR RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hector Rodriguez

Defendants

North Orange County Community College District

NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moon & Yang, APC

Defendant Attorney

Meyers Fozi & Dwork, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 02/01/2022

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 02/01/2022

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 02/01/2022

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 02/01/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1944382 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1944382 REJECTED.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 01/26/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 01/26/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/27/2021 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/27/2021 10:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741264.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12913392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12741264.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 07/14/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 07/14/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 07/14/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 07/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12912059 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12739938.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12912059 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12739938.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 07/12/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 07/12/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 07/12/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 07/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 07/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 07/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/26/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/26/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/26/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 04/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 04/12/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12859282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687001.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12859282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687001.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 03/15/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 03/15/2021

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1946490 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2022 11:18:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31114719 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2022 10:28:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1944382 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 01/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31112641 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2022 03:25:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/27/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C25.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31002738 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2021 04:47:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12859282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2994399 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2021 05:25:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, HECTOR ON 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE is a litigant