This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:58:05 (UTC).

HEATHER BOLEMAN VS JEFFREY BOLEMAN

Case Summary

On 05/04/2017 HEATHER BOLEMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JEFFREY BOLEMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3729

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOLEMAN, HEATHER

Claimant

FIDELITY INVESTMENTS

Respondent

BOLEMAN, JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 08/10/2018; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 07/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • ORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 05/08/2018; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • ORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 05/08/2018; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - COURTROOM JUDGMENT / ORDER 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 02/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 01/30/2018 Fidelity Investments; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 01/30/2018 Fidelity Investments; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 11/21/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 11/21/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 10/26/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/10/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 07/10/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/10/2017 PRELIMINARY; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 06/06/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/06/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • SUMMONS 05/04/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/04/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/04/2017; Filing Party: BOLEMAN, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY INVESTMENTS is a litigant