This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/09/2017 at 09:41:54 (UTC).

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST VS. 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC

Case Summary

On 04/29/2015 HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST filed an Other lawsuit against 2600 MICHELSON DR , LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDW

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

Defendants and Others

GRUBB & ELLIS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC

2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC

GRUBB & ELLIS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MELISSA M. BALLARD

Defendant and Other Attorney

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 05/11/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 05/11/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TP COMPEL PRODUCTION) SUBMITTED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC REJECTED ON 04/27/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TP COMPEL PRODUCTION) SUBMITTED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC REJECTED ON 04/27/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) SUBMITTED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC REJECTED ON 04/27/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) SUBMITTED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC REJECTED ON 04/27/2016.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 04/25/2016

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 04/25/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11950206 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11774371.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11950206 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11774371.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TP COMPEL PRODUCTION) RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TP COMPEL PRODUCTION) RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11940813 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11764997.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11940813 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11764997.

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/01/2016 01:30:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 01/27/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 01/27/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/02/2015 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/02/2015 01:30:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 10/20/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 10/20/2015

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION (COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 05/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4546021 RECEIVED ON 05/11/2016 02:09:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TP COMPEL PRODUCTION) SUBMITTED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC REJECTED ON 04/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (RE MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES) SUBMITTED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC REJECTED ON 04/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 04/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4537836 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2016 01:42:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2016 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 08/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY 2600 MICHELSON DR., LLC ON 08/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4416671 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2015 10:17:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 05/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3286112 RECEIVED ON 05/07/2015 02:31:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11776690 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11600956.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST ON 04/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4369673 RECEIVED ON 04/29/2015 09:51:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grubb & Ellis Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant