This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 03:41:38 (UTC).

HARRY V. DAWSON VS. EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 HARRY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against DAWSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harry V. Dawson III

S & S Holdings Company, Inc.

HARRY V. DAWSON

Defendants

Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

Everest National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Andrew D. Weiss

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13057003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12885019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13057003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12885019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 06/09/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 06/09/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/14/2022 09:39:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/14/2022 09:39:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 07/18/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 07/18/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2022 03:43:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2022 03:43:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31182291 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2022 02:04:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 07/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO LINDA MARKS EFFECTIVE 06/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LINDA MARKS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2022 03:43:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/14/2022 09:39:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41345081 RECEIVED ON 06/09/2022 03:32:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 06/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41339954 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2022 05:24:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13057003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12885019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DAWSON, HARRY V. III; S & S HOLDINGS COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 05/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant