This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 04:38:12 (UTC).

HARRY BERKOWITZ VS. NICHOLAS 'NICK' DELFRANCO

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 HARRY BERKOWITZ filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NICHOLAS 'NICK' DELFRANCO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRY BERKOWITZ

Defendants

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

TOM DELFRANCO

HYDROPONICS HOUSE, LLC

TOM DEL FRANCO

NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO

NICHOLAS DELFRANCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN Y. IGARASHI

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JASON B. CRUZ

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 11/16/2017

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 11/16/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/11/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/11/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2017 08:28:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2017 08:28:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/31/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/31/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12156072 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11979792.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12156072 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11979792.

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/12/2017

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/12/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12151091 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11974874.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12151091 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11974874.

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/02/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/02/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/02/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/02/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12151084 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11974867.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12151084 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11974867.

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/03/2017

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/03/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12151075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11974858.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12151075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11974858.

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/02/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 05/02/2017

NOTICE OF TRIAL (AND MSC) FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 04/12/2017

NOTICE OF TRIAL (AND MSC) FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 04/12/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 04/12/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 04/12/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL FRANCO, TOM ON 03/29/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL FRANCO, TOM ON 03/29/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL FRANCO, NICHOLAS ON 03/29/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL FRANCO, NICHOLAS ON 03/29/2017

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 11/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3576199 RECEIVED ON 08/11/2017 03:56:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/11/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/02/2017 08:28:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4731671 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2017 10:53:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2483266 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2016 12:34:39 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR T.R.O.) FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12009941 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 08/05/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/03/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/03/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BERKOWITZ, HARRY ON 08/03/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 08/03/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less