This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 20:03:19 (UTC).

HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE VS. BREANNA BALLARD

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BREANNA BALLARD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC

Defendant

BREANNA BALLARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: VCC5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 04/20/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 05/11/2022 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE ON 04/15/2022; Filing Party: HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE ON 04/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011622 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839571.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE ON 02/23/2022; Filing Party: HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE INC DBA KIA OF IRVINE ON 02/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hardin Irvine Automotive, Inc. is a litigant