This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:13 (UTC).

HARDIN HYUNDAI VS. E&E AUTO REPAIR

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 HARDIN HYUNDAI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against E E AUTO REPAIR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDIN HYUNDAI

Defendants

SARAH GUZMAN

EDWARD NAVARRO

E&E AUTO REPAIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 04/20/2016; Filing Party: HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 04/20/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 03/21/2016; Filing Party: HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 03/21/2016; Filing Party: HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 03/21/2016; Filing Party: HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HARDIN HYUNDAI FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927932 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752157.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927247 IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927247 IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HARDIN HYUNDAI FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927247 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751472.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: HYUNDAI, HARDIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.