This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 10:17:33 (UTC).

HAR-BRO, INC. VS. EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 HAR-BRO, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAR-BRO, INC.

Defendants and Others

KALPANA MV HOTEL, LLC

KALPANA, LLC

T2 MANAGEMENT, LLC

TARSADIA INVESTMENTS, LLC

M5 DEV, LLC

T2 HOTELS, LLC

KALPANA HOTEL, LLC

T2 DEVELOPMENT, LLC

EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY, LLC

MKP ONE, LLC

Jivan Builders, Inc.

Cross Defendants

Paynet Insurance Services Inc

Jivan Builders, Inc.

Daniel Marion

Construction Service West

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES INC

Defendant and Other Attorneys

HAHN LOESER & PARKS LLP

Hamrick & Evans, LLP

Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Hamrick & Evans, LLP

Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 07/17/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 07/17/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/04/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/04/2019

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 2) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/10/2019

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 2) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/10/2019

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 1) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/10/2019

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 1) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/10/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 02/06/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 02/06/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12318693.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12318693.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 02/04/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 02/04/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/18/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/18/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12482953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12306652.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12482953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12306652.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CONSTRUCTION SERVICE WEST ON 01/04/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CONSTRUCTION SERVICE WEST ON 01/04/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/09/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/09/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12479355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12303036.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12479355 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12303036.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/08/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/08/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HAR-BRO, INC. ON 12/11/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HAR-BRO, INC. ON 12/11/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/18/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/18/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12463785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12287470.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12463785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12287470.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 11/28/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 11/28/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 11/28/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 11/28/2018

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4991257 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2019 09:47:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3798726 RECEIVED ON 06/04/2019 04:50:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 2) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ZOE 1) FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3790586 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019 06:42:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JIVAN BUILDERS, INC. ON 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4935042 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2019 04:45:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12318693.

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1433058 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017 04:05:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HAR-BRO, INC. ON 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3594256 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2017 09:14:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 08/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12201763 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12025500.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HAR-BRO, INC. ON 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HAR-BRO, INC. ON 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HAR-BRO, INC. ON 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2581600 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2017 11:50:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAR-BRO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MKP ONE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EVOLUTION HOSPITALITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant