This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:04 (UTC).

HAN TRINH VS. QUOCANH NHUT NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 HAN TRINH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against QUOCANH NHUT NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THANHHANG NGUYEN

HAN TRINH

PHUONG NAM TRINH

CUONG TRINH

Defendant

QUOCANH NHUT NGUYEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/22/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/22/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY TRINH, HAN ON 05/20/2016; Filing Party: TRINH, HAN ON 05/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927431 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751656.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307094 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:41:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY TRINH, HAN; TRINH, PHUONG NAM; TRINH, CUONG; NGUYEN, THANHHANG ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TRINH, HAN; TRINH, PHUONG NAM; TRINH, CUONG; NGUYEN, THANHHANG ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.