This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 22:10:42 (UTC).

HALL V FLORES

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 HALL filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0049

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexandra Hall

Petitioner

HALL, ALEXANDRA

Defendant

Neil Flores

Respondent

FLORES, NEIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pamela J. Shaffer

 

Court Documents

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016

STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/27/2016

STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/27/2016

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 09/27/2016

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 09/27/2016

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/27/2016

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/27/2016

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2016

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2016

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/29/2016

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/29/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 05/04/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 05/04/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/08/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/08/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/08/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/08/2016

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 02/08/2016 Amount:$435.00

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 02/08/2016 Amount:$435.00

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/14/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/14/2015

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/17/2015 13:36:00 # Pages:1

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/17/2015 13:36:00 # Pages:1

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/17/2015 13:36:00 # Pages:2

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/17/2015 13:36:00 # Pages:2

SUMMONS 11/17/2015 13:35:00 # Pages:2

SUMMONS 11/17/2015 13:35:00 # Pages:2

PETITION - LEGAL SEPARATION 11/17/2015 13:35:00 # Pages:6

PETITION - LEGAL SEPARATION 11/17/2015 13:35:00 # Pages:6

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 09/27/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2016; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/27/2016; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 09/27/2016; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/27/2016; Filing Party: FLORES, NEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016; Filing Party: FLORES, NEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/27/2016; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketCONFERENCE - STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 05/04/2016; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 02/08/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: FLORES, NEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/08/2016; Filing Party: FLORES, NEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/08/2016; Filing Party: FLORES, NEIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/14/2015; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - LEGAL SEPARATION 11/17/2015 13:35:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 11/17/2015 13:35:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/17/2015 13:36:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/17/2015 13:36:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: HALL, ALEXANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFFER, PAMELA JOY