This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:41:54 (UTC).

HAJP, LLC VS. PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 HAJP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAJP, LLC

Defendants

PLUTOS SAMA, LLC

PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Ryan Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Levatolaw, LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 10/14/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 10/14/2021 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 10/01/2021

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 10/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944226 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772123.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944226 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772123.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 09/15/2021

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 09/15/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 09/15/2021

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 09/15/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/26/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/26/2021 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/26/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/26/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/26/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/26/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/18/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/18/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/18/2021 02:26:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/18/2021 02:26:00 PM.

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/13/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/13/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/13/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/13/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/12/2021

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 08/12/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/06/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/06/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/06/2021

RESPONSE FILED BY PLUTOS SAMA HOLDINGS, INC. ON 08/06/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 07/29/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 07/29/2021

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 10/14/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41247435 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021 12:05:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 10/14/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944226 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772123.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1894419 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2021 02:22:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1719491 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2020 01:47:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1719489 RECEIVED ON 02/12/2020 01:44:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/23/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12696343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12521373.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3879235 RECEIVED ON 01/21/2020 03:57:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 01/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HAJP, LLC ON 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plutos Sama, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc. is a litigant