This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:24:24 (UTC).

HAIGHT - PROBATE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 HAIGHT - PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Executor

R L HAIGHT

Decedent

SHIRLEY L HAIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MELINDA ELLIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • (P) CREDITOR'S CLAIM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1472637 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2018 03:05:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM RECEIVED ON 02/26/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM RECEIVED ON 02/26/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3639590 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2018 11:52:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • CREDITOR'S CLAIM - NOT ACTED UPON BY COURT FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 02/23/2018; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 02/21/2018; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3636865 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1464450 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 03:07:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 01/31/2018; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • DECLARATION FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 11/13/2017; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • SUPPLEMENT FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 11/13/2017; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1437453 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017 12:32:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 11/03/2017; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1433489 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017 04:17:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 10/23/2017; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234066 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057748.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1429104 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 02:10:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY HAIGHT, R LEE ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: HAIGHT, R LEE ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.