This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 03:01:39 (UTC).

HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP VS. PETROPRIZE, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2018 HABERBUSH ASSOCIATES, LLP filed an Other lawsuit against PETROPRIZE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP

Defendants

TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS, INC.

PIECO, INC.

PETROPRIZE, INC.

H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Amaro Baldwin LLP

MOZINGO & PATEL, A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PIECO INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,202.13, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551885 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375764.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PIECO INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,202.13, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551885 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375764.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 387.12, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375762.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 387.12, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375762.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HB CRUDE SERVICES INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,393.86, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375760.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HB CRUDE SERVICES INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,393.86, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375760.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 03/13/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 03/13/2019

REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER) FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC. ON 01/31/2019

REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL; ORDER) FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC. ON 01/31/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12490849 AND RECEIPT NUM

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12490849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12314548.

REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC.; PIECO, INC.; TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/29/2019

REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC.; PIECO, INC.; TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/29/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/21/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: JUDGMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/21/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12470918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12294617.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12470918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12294617.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/13/2018.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/13/2018.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 12/17/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 12/17/2018 09:00:00 AM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/13/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/13/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC. ON 12/14/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC. ON 12/14/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4909949 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4909949 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/14/2018 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC.; PIECO, INC.; TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS, INC. ON 11/14/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY H B CRUDE SERVICES, INC.; PIECO, INC.; TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS, INC. ON 11/14/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12451938 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12275637.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12451938 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12275637.

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 344278 TO PIECO INC ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,202.13 DUE TO INTEREST PAYMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 344277 TO TERRA-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 387.12 DUE TO INTEREST PAYMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 344276 TO HB CRUDE SERVICES INC ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,393.86 DUE TO INTEREST PAYMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PIECO INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,202.13, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551885 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375764.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY TERR-AQUA ENVIRO SYSTEMS INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 387.12, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375762.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY HB CRUDE SERVICES INC FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,393.86, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12551881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12375760.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 03/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2772371 RECEIVED ON 03/13/2019 10:09:59 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2644540 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2018 09:22:23 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 02/27/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 01/30/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12291041 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12114773.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER FILED BY HABERBUSH & ASSOCIATES, LLP ON 01/30/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2635506 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2018 11:31:35 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HABERBUSH LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP is a litigant