This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:41 (UTC).

GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. VS. HAI TRAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against HAI TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC.

Defendant

HAI TRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICKER & DICKER LLP

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/25/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/25/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/29/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/29/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/22/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/22/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/29/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/25/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927837 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752062.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927837 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752062.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12033691 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11857696.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12033691 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11857696.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 08/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 08/22/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4542873 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4542873 REJECTED.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/09/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2464944 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2464944 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/22/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 06/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/25/2016

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2648301 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3472251 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2016 11:50:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12033691 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11857696.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/22/16) RECEIVED ON 08/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 9/22/16) RECEIVED ON 08/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4594327 RECEIVED ON 08/22/2016 07:56:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1311808 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2016 02:06:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1311599 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2016 09:40:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO UNASSIGNED EFFECTIVE 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927837 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752062.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GVD COMMERCIAL PROPERTIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385301 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:17:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.