This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 04:04:38 (UTC).

GUL KHODAYAR VS. BRANDON MALDONADO

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 GUL KHODAYAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRANDON MALDONADO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUL KHODAYAR

Defendants and Others

S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

BRANDON MALDONADO

STEVEN ANSTEAD

MALDONADO TILE AND MARBLE, INC.

Cross Defendant

Talisse Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

WELLMAN & WARREN LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

SIMON & SIMON, LLP

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER APC

Other Attorneys

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 03/15/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 03/15/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3769910 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3769910 REJECTED.

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2019

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 02/08/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 02/08/2019 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 02/04/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 02/04/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494262 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12317961.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12494262 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12317961.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MALDONADO, BRANDON; MALDONADO TILE AND MARBLE, INC. ON 01/23/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY MALDONADO, BRANDON; MALDONADO TILE AND MARBLE, INC. ON 01/23/2019

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MALDONADO, BRANDON; MALDONADO TILE AND MARBLE, INC. ON 01/23/2019

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY MALDONADO, BRANDON; MALDONADO TILE AND MARBLE, INC. ON 01/23/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 12/03/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED.) FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 12/03/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT 01/17/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT 01/17/2019 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 01/16/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 01/16/2019

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 01/08/2019

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 01/08/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12463213 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12286898.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12463213 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12286898.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TALISSE CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 11/28/2018

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TALISSE CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 11/28/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12462168 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12285841.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12462168 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12285841.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 12/03/2018

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY S & B CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.; ANSTEAD, STEVEN ON 12/03/2018

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 03/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2773396 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2019 10:34:03 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3769910 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4929573 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019 03:13:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 02/08/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3561941 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2017 12:15:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 06/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3561880 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2017 11:13:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 05/24/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12161471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11985191.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 05/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 05/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KHODAYAR, GUL ON 05/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2557891 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2017 03:47:46 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less