This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:04 (UTC).

GUEVARA-HIGHAM - NAME CHANGE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GUEVARA-HIGHAM - NAME CHANGE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDREA MARIE GUEVARA-HIGHAM

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF .50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11932656 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756841.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF .50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11932656 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11756841.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/14/2016 04:38:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/14/2016 04:38:00 PM.

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (AMENDED) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 04/04/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (AMENDED) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 04/04/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/15/2016

DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 04/18/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING TO NON-PETITIONING PARENT FOR PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 03/09/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING TO NON-PETITIONING PARENT FOR PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 03/09/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (AMENDED) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 03/08/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (AMENDED) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 03/08/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/14/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/14/2016

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/14/2016 04:38:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 06/14/16 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME CONTINUED TO 08/04/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 08/04/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 06/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME (AMENDED) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN D100 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED BY GUEVARA-HIGHAM, ANDREA MARIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.