This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:25:33 (UTC).

GUEST HOUSE LP VS. JOHN SCOTT FRAZER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 GUEST HOUSE LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN SCOTT FRAZER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEST HOUSE LP

Defendant

JOHN SCOTT FRAZER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 11/14/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 11/14/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2628662 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2628662 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12237996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12061676.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12237996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12061676.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 11/14/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 11/14/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/17/2017

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/17/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/15/17) RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/15/17) RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/15/17) RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/15/17) RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 12/15/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 12/15/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/08/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2638652 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2018 07:29:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2628662 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 12/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12237996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12061676.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3597284 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017 01:53:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GUEST HOUSE LP ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775614 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 11:33:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.