This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:29 (UTC).

GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. VS. HARPERS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC filed an Other lawsuit against HARPERS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC.

Respondents

ERICA THOMAS

HARPERS LLC

ERIC BERGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SAMAN BEHNAM

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 05/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 05/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1344860 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1344860 REJECTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 04/28/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 04/28/2016

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

ORDER AFTER HEARING (PETITION TO COMPEL) FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 12/08/2016

ORDER AFTER HEARING (PETITION TO COMPEL) FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 12/08/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 05/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 05/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752669.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752669.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING (PETITION TO COMPEL) FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 12/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2513893 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016 01:38:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1344860 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 05/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 05/06/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION CONTINUED TO 05/27/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2452274 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2016 01:18:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR 05/06/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752669.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY GS INVESTMENT MANAGMENT, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509619 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:42:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.