This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:46:32 (UTC).

GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION VS. LE

Case Summary

On 02/28/2016 GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMM

Defendants

ANH THU T NGUYEN

PHUONG T LE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KEYSTONE PACIFIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 26.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12212705 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12036405.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 08/24/2017; Filing Party: GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KEYSTONE PACIFIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12145423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11969223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 11/10/2016; Filing Party: GROVES AT ORCHARD HIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/10/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 08/25/2016; Filing Party: GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 08/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 08/22/2016.; Filing Party: SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE SUBMITTED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 08/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 08/19/2016; Filing Party: GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/10/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 07/11/2016; Filing Party: GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 07/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KEYSTONE PACIFIC PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11945145 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11769310.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/21/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 02/28/2016; Filing Party: GROVES AT ORCHARD HILLS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 02/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less