This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:59 (UTC).

GREGORIA ORTIZ-MENDEZ VS. MATTHEW A. HOOPER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GREGORIA ORTIZ-MENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MATTHEW A HOOPER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORIA ORTIZ-MENDEZ

Defendant

MATTHEW A. HOOPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEBEDEV, MICHAEL & HELMI

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, BONN & FRIEDMAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 08/04/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 08/04/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12083807 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11907770.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12083807 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11907770.

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 12/27/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 12/27/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/19/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/29/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/29/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 01/18/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 01/18/2017

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 12/27/2016

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 12/27/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 08/04/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 08/04/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12009795 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11833880.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12009795 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11833880.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 08/04/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 08/04/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 07/29/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 07/29/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/19/2016 09:00:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 02/26/2016.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 09/02/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 09/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752098.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752098.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/19/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/19/2016

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3500692 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017 02:47:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 12/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2517143 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2016 09:38:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12083807 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11907770.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY HOOPER, MATTHEW A. ON 12/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2517142 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2016 09:38:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/19/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1335304 RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016 03:03:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4510446 RECEIVED ON 02/29/2016 02:27:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927873 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752098.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ORTIZ-MENDEZ, GREGORIA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307041 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:39:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less