This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 11:33:28 (UTC).

GRANT ROBICHEAUX VS. KASRA ROWSHAN

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 GRANT ROBICHEAUX filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against KASRA ROWSHAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Others

Grant Robicheaux

Kasra Rowshan

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Others

Kasra Rowshan

Linden Properties, LLC

Newport Care MSO, LLC

Newport Care Medical Group, Inc.

Old Newport Group, LLC

Top Surgical, LLC

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Grant Robicheaux

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Other Attorneys

The Law Office of Thomas M. Ferlauto

Steptoe & Johnson LLP

Plaintiff, Defendant and Other Attorney

Steptoe & Johnson LLP

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

The Law Office of Thomas M. Ferlauto

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC ON 09/26/2022

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC ON 09/26/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC ON 09/22/2022

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC ON 09/22/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC ON 09/22/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ROWSHAN, KASRA; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC ON 09/22/2022

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 08/25/2022

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 08/25/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC; ROWSHAN, KASRA ON 07/28/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC; ROWSHAN, KASRA ON 07/28/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13190289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13018415.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13190289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13018415.

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS (FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 03/09/2023

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS (FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 03/09/2023

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 03/09/2023

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 03/09/2023

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/06/2023

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/06/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/22/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/22/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/23/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/23/2023

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC ON 03/06/2023

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC ON 03/06/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/21/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/21/2023

OPPOSITION FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 02/27/2023

OPPOSITION FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 02/27/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/23/2023 10:53:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/23/2023 10:53:00 AM.

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/21/2023

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/21/2023

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: MARKS; Department: CX102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/2023 AT 10:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13190289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13018415.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS (FURTHER RESPONSES TO PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE) FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31280460 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2023 04:19:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.; NEWPORT CARE MSO, LLC; LINDEN PROPERTIES, LLC; OLD NEWPORT GROUP, LLC; TOP SURGICAL, LLC; ROWSHAN, KASRA ON 07/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 06/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21170487 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2022 11:42:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 05/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13054812 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12882828.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ROBICHEAUX, GRANT ON 05/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1993375 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2022 10:21:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less