This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/13/2022 at 06:54:11 (UTC).

GRANITECRETE, INC. VS. CIVIC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 GRANITECRETE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CIVIC CONSTRUCTION ASSOCIATES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Granitecrete, Inc.

Defendants

City of Newport Beach

Civic Construction Associates Inc.

Old Republic Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Porter Law Group, Inc.

Defendant Attorney

City Attoney's Office, City of Newport Beach

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/01/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/01/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/01/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805341.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805341.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/02/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/02/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/15/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/20/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 01/10/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 01/10/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CITY OF NEWPORT BEACH ON 02/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CITY OF NEWPORT BEACH ON 02/01/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF NEWPORT BEACH ON 02/01/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF NEWPORT BEACH ON 02/01/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1946460 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2022 10:42:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF NEWPORT BEACH ON 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CITY OF NEWPORT BEACH ON 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31114801 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2022 11:58:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 01/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41283960 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2022 03:50:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21102063 RECEIVED ON 12/20/2021 03:50:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31097587 RECEIVED ON 12/15/2021 10:04:19 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21095316 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2021 11:23:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977422 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805341.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1923897 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 12:35:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 12/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GRANITECRETE, INC. ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Civil Construction Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant