This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:27:48 (UTC).

GONZALEZ/VALDOVINOS - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GONZALEZ/VALDOVINOS - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems

MARIA E NUNO-VALDIVIA

JESSICA L TIZCARENO

Not Classified By Court

FRANCISCO VALDOVINOS

BENJAMIN TIZCARENO

MARIA TIZCARENO

Minors

ARYANA N GONZALEZ

NATHAN VALDOVINOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZCARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 07/11/2017; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZCARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZCARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 07/11/2017; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZCARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • NOTICE - OTHER (GUARDIANSHIP SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT) FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZCARENO, BENJAMIN ON 04/13/2017; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZCARENO, BENJAMIN ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (STIPULATION TO PARTICIPATE IN VOLUNTARY MEDIATION) FILED BY TIZCARENO, BENJAMIN; TIZCARENO, JESSICA LIZETH; TIZCARENO, MARIA; NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES ON 04/13/2017; Filing Party: TIZCARENO, BENJAMIN; TIZCARENO, JESSICA LIZETH; TIZCARENO, MARIA; NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES ON 04/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • THE (P) REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/2018 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C7.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) COURT TRIAL 04/13/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • JESSICA LIZETH TIZCARENO, MARIA EDUVIJES NUNO-VALDIVIA APPOINTED AS CO-GUARDIAN OF PERSON ONLY OF NATHAN VALDOVINOS AND ARYANA NOEMI GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DUTIES OF GUARDIAN FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) FILED BY NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/29/2016; Filing Party: NUNO-VALDIVIA, MARIA EDUVIJES; TIZVARENO, JESSICA LIZETH ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.