This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:10:59 (UTC).

GONZALES V GONZALES

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 GONZALES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GONZALES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7507

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nanette M. Gonzales

Petitioner

GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

Defendant

Manuel J. Gonzales

Respondent

GONZALES, MANUEL JESUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2015
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 03/03/2015 09:30:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/03/2015 09:29:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/03/2015 12:33:00 GRANTED NO MOVING DOCS; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/29/2014 13:31:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • STIPULATION - TEMPORARY JUDGE 04/25/2014 14:25:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 04/25/2014 14:52:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/25/2014 14:52:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • JUDGMENT 04/25/2014 14:51:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/25/2014 15:30:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/25/2014 08:15:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2013
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 12/19/2013 16:20:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/19/2013 16:20:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 12/18/2013 14:34:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/12/2013 15:49:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/19/2013 14:38:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 13:36:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 13:35:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 13:35:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 08/12/2013 16:17:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 08/12/2013 16:14:00 FW GRANTED # Pages:2; Filing Party: GONZALES, NANETTE MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less