This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 03:47:08 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA VS. VICENTE CHIN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICENTE CHIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA

Defendant

VICENTE CHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163277 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991374.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163277 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991374.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE DILIGENCE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 02/03/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE DILIGENCE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 02/03/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21267959 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2023 12:14:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (RE DILIGENCE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 02/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163277 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991374.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11087100 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 10:48:11 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less