This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 03:46:54 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA VS. NICKIE HONG

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICKIE HONG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA

Defendant

NICKIE HONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163278 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991375.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163278 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991375.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE DILIGENCE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 02/10/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE DILIGENCE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 02/10/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31268526 RECEIVED ON 02/10/2023 03:23:37 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (RE DILIGENCE) FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163278 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991375.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41433318 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 11:00:28 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less