This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/01/2022 at 06:48:53 (UTC).

GLORIA LAMUG VS. MEDTRONIC INC.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 GLORIA LAMUG filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MEDTRONIC INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gloria Lamug

Defendants

Covidien L.P

Medtronic Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Hawkins APLC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12959676 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12787585.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12959676 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12787585.

COMPLAINT FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/19/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/19/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/21/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 12/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 12/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 12/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 12/16/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/21/2021 11:29:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/21/2021 11:29:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SHERMAN; Department: CX105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/21/2021 11:29:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31098055 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 08:49:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21100667 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2021 08:49:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31077210 RECEIVED ON 10/21/2021 04:19:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12959676 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12787585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41253785 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2021 10:39:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 10/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LAMUG, GLORIA ON 10/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWKINS JAMES ROSS