This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/11/2017 at 06:58:42 (UTC).

GLENN MCCANNA VS. AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/20/2011 GLENN MCCANNA filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

MARIAH MCCANNA

GLENN MCCANNA

MARIA ELENA MANZO

TRW AUTOMOTICE GMBH

QUALITY CARE COMPANY

SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION

TAKATA OF NORTH AMERICA

TRW POLSKA AP. ZO. O.

TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP

CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

GM KOREA

DAEWOO PERCISION INDUSTRIES CO LTD

S & T MOTIV CO LTD

TAKATA CORPORATION

AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION

S & T DAEWOO

TK HOLDINGS, INC

G M DAEWOO AUTO & TECHNOLOGY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION

GLENN MCCANNA

TAKATA OF NORTH AMERICA

TAKATA CORPORATION

AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION

Others and Defendants

MARIA ELENA MANZO

MARK W. EISENBERG

EISENBERG LAW FIRM, APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

EISENBERG LAW FIRM, APC

JERRY N. GANS, ESQ.

WESIERSKI & ZUREK, LLP

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

DYKEMA GOSSETT LLP

ISAACS CLOUSE & CROSE LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

WESIERSKI & ZUREK, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 05/14/2015

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 05/14/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 05/14/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 05/14/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/20/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/20/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 12/19/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 12/19/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/31/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/31/2014 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GM KOREA ON 10/31/2014

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GM KOREA ON 10/31/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/25/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 07/25/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 04/25/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 04/25/2014 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GM KOREA ON 04/25/2014

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GM KOREA ON 04/25/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GM KOREA ON 04/17/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GM KOREA ON 04/17/2014

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION; GM KOREA ON 03/28/2014

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION; GM KOREA ON 03/28/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 03/28/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 03/28/2014 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 02/24/2014

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 02/24/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4150460 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4150460 REJECTED.

CORRESPONDENCE (RETURNED) FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 02/21/2014

CORRESPONDENCE (RETURNED) FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 02/21/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 02/18/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 02/18/2014

164 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 05/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN ON 05/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 05/15/2015 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/15/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/20/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 04/03/2015 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
258 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11020655 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10844547.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION ON 10/31/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN; MCCANNA, GLENN ON 10/17/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN; MCCANNA, MARIAN ON 10/04/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN; MCCANNA, MARIAN ON 09/22/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10995484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10819376.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOBERLY, JAMOA ON 09/20/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN; MCCANNA, MARIAN ON 09/20/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN; MCCANNA, MARIAN ON 09/20/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MCCANNA, GLENN; MCCANNA, MARIAN ON 09/20/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRW AUTOMOTIVE GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Automotive GmbH is a litigant

Latest cases where American Suzuki Motor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where TRW Automotive Holdings Corp is a litigant