This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2020 at 07:01:42 (UTC).

GLENN A FERRO VS. SAFETY-KLEEN SYSTEMS, INC.,A WISCONSIN CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 GLENN A FERRO filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SAFETY-KLEEN SYSTEMS, INC ,A WISCONSIN CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glenn A Ferro

Kristin E. Ferro

Defendants

Calsol, Inc

O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.

BC Stocking Distributing

RSC Chemical Solutions, LLC

Kern Oil & Refining Co.

Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.,a Wisconsin corporation

Technical Chemical

CRC Industries, Inc.

Porter Manufacturing & Supply Company, LLC

WD-40 Company

Chevron U.S.A., Inc.

Berryman Products, Inc.

Illinois Tool Works, Inc

Petro Source Refining Corporation

Krylon Products Group

3M Company

Union Oil Company of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Metzger Law Group

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/10/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/02/2020 03:44:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/02/2020 03:44:00 PM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/06/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/06/2020.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12706170 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12531310.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12706170 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12531310.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1736544 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2020 12:20:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 04/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3903555 RECEIVED ON 04/02/2020 01:40:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12706170 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12531310.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1717232 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2020 10:53:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FERRO, GLENN A; FERRO, KRISTIN E. ON 02/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KRYLON PRODUCTS GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PETRO SOURCE REFINING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CALSOL INC. is a litigant