This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/04/2019 at 06:46:11 (UTC).

GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS. LIVE MEDIA GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 GLASSRATNER ADVISORY CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIVE MEDIA GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group LLC

GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP L

Defendant

Live Media Group Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brown Rudnick LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12591413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12415456.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12591413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12415456.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 07/22/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 07/22/2019.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/29/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/29/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 08/27/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 08/27/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1659889 RECEIVED ON 08/27/2019 04:22:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3817399 RECEIVED ON 07/29/2019 09:29:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 07/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12591413 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12415456.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC ON 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2818205 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2019 01:05:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant