This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/15/2017 at 06:58:45 (UTC).

GINA LA MONICA VS. SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/08/2015 GINA LA MONICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINA LA MONICA

Defendants

SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE

WALSH & ASSOCIATES, APC

SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANTICOUNI & ASSOCIATES

OSHEA ORCHID

Defendant Attorney

WALSH & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/18/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/18/2017 01:30:00 PM.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/17/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/17/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1374260 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1374260 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS 04/13/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS 04/13/2017 01:30:00 PM.

OPPOSITION FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 03/30/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 03/30/2017

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 03/17/2017

MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 03/17/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/17/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/17/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE HEARINGS) FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 11/07/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE HEARINGS) FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 11/07/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 02/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 02/16/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 12/22/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 12/22/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3344130 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3344130 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 10/05/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 10/05/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 07/27/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 07/27/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2015 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 06/09/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 06/09/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11797039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11621367.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11797039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11621367.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2547427 RECEIVED ON 04/17/2017 10:12:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1380379 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2017 10:52:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/18/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 11/27/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/27/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 04/18/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY SOUTH ORANGE COUNTY COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ON 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2547426 RECEIVED ON 04/17/2017 10:12:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 06/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4396588 RECEIVED ON 06/23/2015 03:56:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 06/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1262886 RECEIVED ON 06/09/2015 03:27:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3296501 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 06/08/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11797039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11621367.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 06/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LA MONICA, GINA ON 06/08/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3296300 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2015 05:25:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walsh & Associated, APC is a litigant

Latest cases where South Orange County Community College District is a litigant