This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:24:14 (UTC).

GIBSON - PROBATE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 GIBSON - PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

CARROLL A GIBSON

Executors

LISA J GIBSON

LISA J GIBSON-WINGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOSE MARIANO CASTILLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 03/08/2018 10:08:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 3/1/2018 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4821262 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2018 04:08:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • ORDER FOR PROBATE FILED BY GIBSON, LISA J. ON 03/08/2018; Filing Party: GIBSON, LISA J. ON 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY 03/01/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • THE COURT SETS A (P) REVIEW HEARING FOR 09/17/2019 AT 03:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT C08 FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • WILL WAIVES BOND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • LISA J. GIBSON APPOINTED AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF CARROLL A. GIBSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY LISA J. GIBSOB IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED, EXCEPT THE COURT GRANTS LIMITED IAEA POWERS.; Filing Party: LISA J. GIBSOB IS APPROVED AS SUPPLEMENTED, EXCEPT THE COURT GRANTS LIMITED IAEA POWERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED TO 12/21/2017 AT 02:00 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 12/21/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY 11/16/2017 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3602684 RECEIVED ON 10/30/2017 04:12:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY GIBSON, LISA J. ON 10/30/2017; Filing Party: GIBSON, LISA J. ON 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • WILL FILED BY GIBSON, LISA J. ON 10/13/2017; Filing Party: GIBSON, LISA J. ON 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234943 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058622.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601236 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 07:04:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY GIBSON, LISA J. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GIBSON, LISA J. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.