This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 10:55:04 (UTC).

GHADA SOMI VS. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 GHADA SOMI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHADA SOMI

Defendants

BRIAN M. HAYNES

DANIEL HEAD

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA, INC.

INVENSYS LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANE LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

Seyfarth Shaw, LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 08/06/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 08/06/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/03/2018 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/03/2018 09:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 08/01/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 08/01/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/15/2018 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/15/2018 09:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 06/08/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 06/08/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 06/08/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 06/08/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HAYNES, BRIAN M.; HEAD, DANIEL; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA, INC. ON 06/07/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HAYNES, BRIAN M.; HEAD, DANIEL; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA, INC. ON 06/07/2018

CASE TRANSFERRED FROM CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER TO NORTH JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 04/23/2018.

CASE TRANSFERRED FROM CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER TO NORTH JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 04/23/2018.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HAYNES, BRIAN M.; HEAD, DANIEL; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA, INC. ON 03/26/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HAYNES, BRIAN M.; HEAD, DANIEL; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC, SE; SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SYSTEMS USA, INC. ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 03/26/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/17/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/17/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4805628 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4805628 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 01/16/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 01/16/2018.

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/16/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/16/2018

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4873453 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2018 12:44:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/03/2018 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT N17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 08/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2697296 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2018 12:09:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4828653 RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018 09:05:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3626531 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2018 10:13:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4805628 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 01/16/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12282627 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12106367.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SOMI, GHADA ON 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4805425 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2018 01:49:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Invensys Systems Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC (USA), INC. is a litigant