This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:17:35 (UTC).

GERARD VAN EGMOND VS KRISTY FISCHER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 GERARD VAN EGMOND filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KRISTY FISCHER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8297

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

Respondent

FISCHER, KRISTY ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 01/22/2019; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/22/2019; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 01/22/2019; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 01/22/2019; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/05/2018; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 02/05/2018; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/23/2017; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: VAN EGMOND, GERARD J

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.