This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/13/2020 at 06:40:44 (UTC).

GEORGE C.J. CHUNG VS. PAUL LIANG

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 GEORGE C J CHUNG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAUL LIANG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George C.J. Chung

Ching-Chih Chung

Defendants

See Virtual World 2, LLC

See Virtual World Enterprises, LLC

Paul Liang

See Virtual World 1, LLC

See Virtual Worlds, LLC

See Virtual Worlds Operations, LLC

See Virtual World Consulting Operations, LLC

Adrian De Leon

See Virtual World MJ

See Games, LLC

James Liang

GMT Mobile Games, Inc

See Global Entertainment.com

Corey Redmond

See Virtual World Calypso, LLC

See Virtual World MJ Operations, LLC

Martin Biallas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tao Rossini, APC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2020 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2020 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHUNG, CHING-CHIH; CHUNG, GEORGE C.J. ON 01/13/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHUNG, CHING-CHIH; CHUNG, GEORGE C.J. ON 01/13/2020

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 12/30/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 12/30/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12683760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12508659.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12683760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12508659.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHUNG, GEORGE C.J.; CHUNG, CHING-CHIH ON 12/30/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHUNG, GEORGE C.J.; CHUNG, CHING-CHIH ON 12/30/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHUNG, GEORGE C.J.; CHUNG, CHING-CHIH ON 12/30/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHUNG, GEORGE C.J.; CHUNG, CHING-CHIH ON 12/30/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: C15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2020 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1707659 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2020 10:18:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHUNG, CHING-CHIH; CHUNG, GEORGE C.J. ON 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12683760 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12508659.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41049804 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2019 09:29:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 12/30/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHUNG, GEORGE C.J.; CHUNG, CHING-CHIH ON 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CHUNG, GEORGE C.J.; CHUNG, CHING-CHIH ON 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEE GAMES LLC is a litigant