This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 09:01:55 (UTC).

GENAE AFFRUNTI VS. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 GENAE AFFRUNTI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Genae Affrunti

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Veracis Law Corporation

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/20/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772158.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772158.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GRIFFIN; Department: N17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41242444 RECEIVED ON 09/20/2021 12:26:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12944261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12772158.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41240885 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2021 05:03:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 09/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AFFRUNTI, GENAE ON 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant