This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:28:39 (UTC).

GELTNER - PROBATE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GELTNER - PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Executor

GARY E GRAFF

Decedent

ROBERT M GELTNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Executor Attorney

HOWARD BRIEF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 06/02/2017; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3542690 RECEIVED ON 05/08/2017 01:04:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, CONSERVATOR OR GUARDIAN UPON COMPLETION OF COURT-ORDERED DISTRIBUTION OR TRANSFER RECEIVED ON 05/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ORDER ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 04/24/2017; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4707732 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2017 01:54:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION 04/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • CASE STATUS UPDATED TO CASE CLOSED - ORDER GRANTED EFFECTIVE 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3481453 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2016 03:30:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/02/2016; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • WILL/CODICIL FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/02/2016; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307565 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016 01:48:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/01/2016; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/01/2016; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 03/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928428 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752646.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • SURETY NOT IN GOOD STANDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509671 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:37:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY GRAFF, GARY E. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: GRAFF, GARY E. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.