This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 06:41:32 (UTC).

GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. VS. STAR SCRAP METAL COMPANY., INC.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 GATES DEVELOPMENT CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STAR SCRAP METAL COMPANY , INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gates Development Co.

Defendants

Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Metal Depot, Inc.

Star Scrap Metal Company., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Thomas F. Nowland

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12968298 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12796221.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12968298 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12796221.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 12/07/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21096878 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 07:59:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12968298 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12796221.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21086793 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2021 03:43:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 11/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GATES DEVELOPMENT CO. ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Star Scrap Metal Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where METAL DEPOT INC. (DOE 17) is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant