This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:36 (UTC).

GARY W. ZIEBARTH VS. ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 GARY W ZIEBARTH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAMELA C. ZIEBARTH

GARY W. ZIEBARTH

Defendants

DAVID BRENT ADAMS

JACK CAWOOD

CHASE ONE LLC

ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID B. DIMITRUK

DAWSON & DAWSON

Defendant Attorney

CUMMING & ASSOCIATES, APLC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 07/25/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 07/25/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS TO CHASE ONE, LLC ONLY) FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 03/22/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PUNITIVE DAMAGES AS TO CHASE ONE, LLC ONLY) FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 03/22/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 02/26/2016.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 06/19/2017

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 06/19/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 04/10/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE - OTHER (REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES) FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 09/06/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (REPORTER PER DIEM AND JURY FEES) FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 09/06/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/27/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/27/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/03/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/03/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/09/2017 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 09/08/2016

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 09/08/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 06/24/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 06/24/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2548547 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2548547 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/09/2017 03:15:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 05/09/2017 03:15:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12173537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11997239.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12173537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11997239.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 04/10/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 04/10/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4693469 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4693469 REJECTED.

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (RE THE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC; ADAMS, DAVID BRENT ON 03/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 2018-03-15 13:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • COURT TRIAL CONTINUED TO 05/07/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/07/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12314566 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12138342.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/14/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY ADAMS, DAVID BRENT; ENCLAVE ASSETS, LLC ON 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1478317 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2018 10:01:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2449001 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2016 03:45:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3386753 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 11:45:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3386325 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928520 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752738.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ZIEBARTH, GARY W.; ZIEBARTH, PAMELA C. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446865 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:37:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.