This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 06:48:56 (UTC).

GARY MARSH VS. THE KROGER CO.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 GARY MARSH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Marsh

Defendants

Ralph's Grocery Company

The Kroger Co.

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schlichter & Shonack, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Gates, Gonter, Guy Proudfoot & Muench, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12920857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12748716.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12920857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12748716.

REQUEST - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

REQUEST - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 07/07/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 07/07/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 07/07/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 07/07/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12902779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12730578.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12902779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12730578.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SLAUGHTER; Department: N15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12920857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12748716.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41221375 RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021 09:49:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21046133 RECEIVED ON 07/27/2021 09:49:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ALPHA BETA COMPANY ON 07/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 07/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1867249 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2021 08:31:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21032625 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2021 02:59:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/24/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SLAUGHTER, FRED ON 06/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12902779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12730578.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MARSH, GARY ON 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41207442 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2021 08:13:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPHA BETA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant