This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 06:57:01 (UTC).

GARRETT YOSHITAKE SATO VS. PHILIP A. AIBAUDO

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 GARRETT YOSHITAKE SATO filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PHILIP A AIBAUDO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARRETT YOSHITAKE SATO

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC.

PHILIP A. AIBAUDO

MILAN SERKVOICH

PHILIP A. RIBAUDO

MILAN SERKOVICH

LISA HARPER

LISA HARPER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUST

LISA HARPER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE LISA HA

Lisa Harper, as Trustee of the Lisa harper revocable Trust dates october 11, 2006

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE

Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company

Trish Olivia Coury

Lisa Harper, individually and as Trustee of the Lisa Harper Revocable Trust Dated October 11, 2006, and as Amended January 28, 2011

HOME INSPECTOR

SCCE, Inc

Pamela L. Etem

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D. WEISS

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PETTIBONE LAW

PHILIP A. KRAFT & ASSOCIATES

Sobel & Associates

VAN RIPER LAW

Law Department Coldwell Banker Residential Brokerage Company

Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

Other Attorneys

LAW DEPARTMENT COLDWELL BANKER RESIDEN

MANNING & KASS ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TRESTE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY ON 04/11/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL BROKERAGE COMPANY ON 04/11/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 11/19/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 11/19/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 11/15/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 11/15/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 11/15/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 11/15/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/15/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/15/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 04/27/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 04/27/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12278700 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12102440.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12278700 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12102440.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/03/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/03/2018 08:30:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 10/20/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 10/20/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 09/28/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 09/28/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RIBAUDO, PHILIP A. ON 09/18/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RIBAUDO, PHILIP A. ON 09/18/2017

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 09/06/2017.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 09/06/2017.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 08/18/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 08/18/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 08/18/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GALLA-RINI ROOFING INC. ON 08/18/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RIBAUDO, PHILIP A. ON 08/16/2017

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY RIBAUDO, PHILIP A. ON 08/16/2017

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 07/03/2017

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 07/03/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592982 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12417041.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY COURY, TRISH OLIVIA ON 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2819806 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2019 02:56:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/01/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/01/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • THE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2020 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/01/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4744264 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017 09:55:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 06/29/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12180716 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12004426.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SATO, GARRETT YOSHITAKE ON 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4743539 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2017 02:12:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less