This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 06:31:34 (UTC).

GARCIA VS. LEE

Case Summary

On 08/07/2014 GARCIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LEE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMADO SANDRIA ZARATE

JOSE GARCIA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Others

KEE JAE LEE

B& LEE, INC.

YOUNG TAE BECK

B & LEE, INC.

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTOR'S INDEMNITY COMPANY

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

PHILADELPHIA INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPA

Great American Insurance Company

Young Beck Realty Corp

AMERICAN CONTRACTOR'S INDEMNITY COMPAN

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Others

AMADO SANDRIA ZARATE

JOSE GARCIA

KEE JAE LEE

YOUNG TAE BECK

B & LEE, INC.

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Rainbow Auto Spa

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Others

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTOR'S INDEMNITY COMPANY

Great American Insurance Company

AMERICAN CONTRACTOR'S INDEMNITY COMPAN

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BLACKMAN LAW FIRM

MAURICE MANDEL II

THE BLACKMAN LAW FIRM

LAW OFFICE OF ROSA KWONG

LK Professional Law Group

Law Offices of Michael S. Lee, P.C.

Law Offices of Peter Beck, APLC

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF ROSA KWONG

LK Professional Law Group

Law Offices of Michael S. Lee, P.C.

Law Offices of Peter Beck, APLC

Booth, Mitchel & Strange LLP

LANAK & HANNA, P.C.

Hausman & Sosa, LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

Booth, Mitchel & Strange LLP

LANAK & HANNA, P.C.

Other Attorneys

CNP LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BECK, YOUNG TAE ON 08/05/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BECK, YOUNG TAE ON 08/05/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416349.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416349.

MOTION - OTHER (FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL) FILED BY B & LEE, INC. ON 07/24/2019

MOTION - OTHER (FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL) FILED BY B & LEE, INC. ON 07/24/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BECK, YOUNG TAE ON 06/11/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BECK, YOUNG TAE ON 06/11/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOUNG BECK REALTY CORP ON 06/11/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOUNG BECK REALTY CORP ON 06/11/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY B & LEE, INC. ON 06/11/2019

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY B & LEE, INC. ON 06/11/2019

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA; GARCIA, JOSE ON 04/03/2019

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA; GARCIA, JOSE ON 04/03/2019

ORDER - OTHER (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STIPULATION FOR SUSPENSION/STAY OF CASE AND WAIVER OF DISCRETIONARY AND/OR MANDATORY DISMISSAL UNDER THE CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE) FILED BY YOUNG BECK REALTY CORP; BECK, YOUNG TAE; B & LEE, IN

ORDER - OTHER (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND STIPULATION FOR SUSPENSION/STAY OF CASE AND WAIVER OF DISCRETIONARY AND/OR MANDATORY DISMISSAL UNDER THE CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE) FILED BY YOUNG BECK REALTY CORP; BECK, YOUNG TAE; B & LEE, INC. ON 03/14/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/08/2019.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/08/2019.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA; GARCIA, JOSE ON 01/15/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA; GARCIA, JOSE ON 01/15/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA; GARCIA, JOSE ON 01/15/2019

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA; GARCIA, JOSE ON 01/15/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/10/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/10/2019 01:30:00 PM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY; SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/04/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY; SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/04/2019

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE - OTHER (DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH THE COURT) FILED BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE - OTHER (DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH THE COURT) FILED BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE - OTHER (DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH THE COURT) FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE - OTHER (DEPOSIT FUNDS WITH THE COURT) FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (OR ORDER) FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (OR ORDER) FILED BY HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/21/2018

386 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BECK, YOUNG TAE ON 08/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4997941 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2019 10:20:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • MOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 08/16/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416349.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION - OTHER (FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL) FILED BY B & LEE, INC. ON 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1647871 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2019 05:07:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BECK, YOUNG TAE ON 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY YOUNG BECK REALTY CORP ON 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY B & LEE, INC. ON 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4979165 RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019 04:37:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
644 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2014
  • GARCIA, JOSE, ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • GARCIA, JOSE, ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 08/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GARCIA, JOSE; ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GARCIA, JOSE; ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY GARCIA, JOSE; ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GARCIA, JOSE; ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, JOSE; ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, JOSE; ZARATE, AMADO SANDRIA ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3176752 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2014 04:45:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOW AUTO is a litigant

Latest cases where B& LEE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant