Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 07:05:21 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS. WHITE GLOVE CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WHITE GLOVE CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ganahl Lumber Company

Defendants

Washington International Insurance Company

White Glove Construction

Scott Callison

Theodora A Parnavelas

Navigators Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORMAN A FILER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/26/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/26/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/24/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/24/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/23/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/23/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/23/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/23/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/24/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/24/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41169888 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41169888 REJECTED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 191) FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/23/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 191) FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/23/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/23/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/23/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/04/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/04/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12834561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12661949.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12834561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12661949.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1827690 RECEIVED ON 03/26/2021 09:54:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2998377 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021 04:06:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3994431 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2021 10:52:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3995310 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2021 04:06:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41169888 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2982750 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2021 03:20:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 02/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2981397 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2021 03:21:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12834561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12661949.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1804615 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2021 10:13:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY ON 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ganahl Lumber Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington International Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Theodora A Parnavelas is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant